EP1447801 - Slot-in type reproducing/recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makisaka, Yukinari, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | 02 /
Ooizumi, Kenjirou, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | 03 /
Konno, Youichi, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | 04 /
Kikuchi, Kenji, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/34] | 01 /
Marisaka, Yukinari, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | ||
02 /
Ooizumi, Kenjirou, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | |||
03 /
Konno, Youichi, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | |||
04 /
Kikuchi, Kenji, c/o Pioneer Corporation Tokorozawa Plant 2610, Hanazono 4-chome Tokorozawa-shi Saitama 359-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250731.9 | 11.02.2004 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | JP20030035696 | 13.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003035696 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1447801 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1447801 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/04 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
G11B17/0404 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/07] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs-/wiedergabegerät mit Einsteckladung | [2004/41] | English: | Slot-in type reproducing/recording apparatus | [2004/34] | French: | Appareil d' enregistrement/lecture du type à encartement | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/34] | Aufzeichnungs-/Wiedergabegerät mit Einsteckladung | ||
Former [2004/34] | Appareil d'enregistrement/lecture du type à encartement | Examination procedure | 15.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 24.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/35] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4627042 (HARA NOBUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US4695996 (SUGIHARA MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 1 - column 15, line 43; figures 2,6 *; | [A]EP1035541 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0041] - [0062] *; | [A]US2002044520 (KABASAWA HIDETOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0155] - [0158]; figures 1-14 * |