EP1447960 - Wireless communication device, system and communication method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Pinpoint Company Limited 10/F &11/F Tianjin Building, 167 Connaught Road West Hong Kong / HK | [2004/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lewis-Evans, Jonathan P. 10/F & 11/F Tianjin Bldg, 167 Connaught Road West Hong Kong / HK | 02 /
Tang, Michael T.H. 10/F & 11/F Tianjin Bldg, 167 Connaught Road West Hong Kong / HK | 03 /
Chung, Po Yang 14C Celestial Garden, 5 Repulse Bay Road Hong Kong / HK | 04 /
Ku, Ava Yat Lai, 19/F., Flat D., Block 42 Mei Foo Sun Chuen, Broadway Street Kowloon, Hong Kong / HK | 05 /
Chan, Andrew Wing Nin, Flat H., 41/F., Block 2 Well On Garden, Tseung Kwan O New Territories, Hong Kong / KH | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Howe, Steven Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250759.0 | 12.02.2004 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | CN2003101025 | 12.02.2003 Original published format: CN 03101025 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1447960 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1447960 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04M11/04 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
G08B25/016 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drahtloses Kommunikationsgerät , System und Kommunikationsverfahren | [2004/34] | English: | Wireless communication device, system and communication method | [2004/34] | French: | Appareil de communication sans fil , système et méthode de communication | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6226510 (BOLING BRIAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,20,21,23,28,32-35 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 4; figures 1-4 * * column 6, line 18 - column 8, line 38; figure 5 * * column 10, line 16 - line 32 *; | [XA]WO0173960 (AMERICAN SECURE CARE LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,21,23,25,28 * page 5, line 16 - page 12, line 7; figures 1-3 * * page 13, line 18 - page 17, line 27; figure 10 * [A] 33; | [XA]WO0178032 (LINLAN RES AND DESIGN COMPANY [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,21,28,29,31 * page 4, line 5 - page 6, line 28 * * page 8, line 14 - line 28 * * page 14, line 5 - page 19, line 24; figures 1-10 * [A] 11-13,33; | [XA]US2002098874 (ZIRUL JOCELYN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,14,16,20-24,28-32 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0062]; figure 4C * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0075]; figure 5 * [A] 33-38; | [XA]US6477363 (AYOUB MOHAMAD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,21,28,30 * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 39; figures 1-3 *[A] 3,5,7,33 |