Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] |
14.10.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.06.2006 | Publication of search report | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
30.03.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.07.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |