Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004224701 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HK03101025 | 12.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004200519 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HK03101025 | 12.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1447960 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2006 | A3 | EP1447960 | 18.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | HK03101025 | 12.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1057973 | 08.04.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | HK03101025 | 12.02.2003 |