EP1450015 - Honeycomb filter and exhaust gas purification system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichikawa, Yukihito c/o IPD NGK Insulators Ltd 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Toshio c/o IPD NGK Insulators Ltd 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250835.8 | 17.02.2004 | Priority number, date | JP20030039426 | 18.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003039426 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450015 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450015 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/035, F01N3/28, F01N3/022 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D46/2451 (EP,US);
B01D46/2459 (EP,US);
B01D46/64 (EP,US);
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
C04B35/185 (EP,US);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B35/478 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/581 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B38/0016 (EP,US);
C04B38/008 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
C04B2237/062 (EP,US);
C04B2237/341 (EP,US);
C04B2237/343 (EP,US);
C04B2237/346 (EP,US);
C04B2237/348 (EP,US);
C04B2237/363 (EP,US);
C04B2237/365 (EP,US);
C04B2237/366 (EP,US);
C04B2237/368 (EP,US);
C04B2237/78 (EP,US);
C04B2237/88 (EP,US);
F01N2250/02 (EP,US);
F01N2330/02 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
F01N2330/30 (EP,US);
F01N2510/06 (EP,US);
F01N2510/063 (EP,US);
F01N2570/10 (EP,US);
F01N2570/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/00 (EP,US);
C04B38/0016, C04B35/185, C04B35/195, C04B35/478, C04B35/565, C04B35/581, C04B38/0012 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/20] |
Former [2004/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wabenfilter und Abgasreinigungssystem | [2004/35] | English: | Honeycomb filter and exhaust gas purification system | [2004/35] | French: | Filtre en nid d'abeilles et système de purification des gaz d'échappement | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05017556.1 / EP1598534 | Opposition(s) | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0225402 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 2 * page 7, line 20 - line 27; figures 5-7 * * page 9, line 16 - line 30 *; | [X]EP0766993 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1217185 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0046]; figures 2-9 *; | [A]WO02070106 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 12-14* abstract *; | [X]EP1245801 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-7,9,11 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0081]; figures 18-22 * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0178]; figures 33-38 *; | [A]EP1256369 (FLEETGUARD INC [US]) [A] 1,6-11 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012]; figures 2-4 * | Examination | US4519820 | EP1231363 | by applicant | JP2001269585 |