EP1455229 - Silicon-containing fluorinated polymers and photoresists comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials, LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough Massachusetts 01752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials, L.L.C. 455 Forest Street Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barclay, George G. 1566 Main Street Jefferson, Massachusetts 01522 / US | 02 /
Kanagasabapathy, Subbareddy 28 Jasmine Drive Worcester, Massachusetts 01605 / US | 03 /
Pohlers, Gerhard 21 Gardner Street Newton, Massachusetts 02458 / US | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2004/37] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd., 28th Floor, City Point, One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04250947.1 | 23.02.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | US20030449787P | 23.02.2003 Original published format: US 449787 P | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455229 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/075 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G03F7/0045 (EP,US);
A01K97/10 (KR);
C08G77/24 (EP,US);
C08G77/28 (EP,US);
G03F7/0046 (EP,US);
G03F7/0757 (EP,US);
G03F7/0382 (EP,US);
G03F7/0392 (EP,US);
Y10S269/907 (KR);
Y10S81/01 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/21] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Silikon enthaltende fluorierte Polymere und diese enthaldende Photoresiste | [2004/37] | English: | Silicon-containing fluorinated polymers and photoresists comprising same | [2004/37] | French: | Polymères fluorés contenant du silicium, photoréserve contenant ces derniers | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 02.05.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5413863 (WEBER ANDREW M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9 * claim - *; | [DX]US2002090572 (SOORIYAKUMARAN RATNAM [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,6-10 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO02091083 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [DX] 1-7,9,10 * page 6, line 7 - page 10, line 6 *; | [E]EP1422565 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [E] 1-10* paragraphs [0049] - [0053]; example - * |