EP1578162 - Method and system for facilitating a level-3 handoff [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buckley, Adrian 990 Woodsong Lane Brentwood, California 94513 / US | 02 /
Dunk, Craig 23 Grey Oak Drive Guelph, Ontario N1L 1P2 / CA | 03 /
Kezys, Vytautas Robertas 24 Hackney Court Hamilton, Ontario L9K 1M3 / CA | 04 /
Owen, Russell 450 Chesapeake Drive Waterloo, Ontario N2K 4B8 / CA | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [2008/44] |
Former [2005/38] | Rickard, David John 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251163.4 | 27.02.2004 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1578162 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1578162 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04L29/06 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H04W36/18 (EP);
H04W48/18 (KR,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,KR);
H04W88/06 (EP,KR);
H04W36/0011 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | 26.03.2004 | LT | 26.03.2004 | LV | 26.03.2004 | MK | 26.03.2004 | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Besserung eines level-3 Weiterreichens | [2005/38] | English: | Method and system for facilitating a level-3 handoff | [2005/38] | French: | Procédé et système pour l'amélioration d'un transfert d'appel de niveau trois | [2005/38] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 08.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07118633.2 / EP1876857 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.02.2008 | BE | 20.02.2008 | CY | 20.02.2008 | CZ | 20.02.2008 | DK | 20.02.2008 | EE | 20.02.2008 | FI | 20.02.2008 | IT | 20.02.2008 | NL | 20.02.2008 | RO | 20.02.2008 | SI | 20.02.2008 | SK | 20.02.2008 | TR | 20.02.2008 | IE | 27.02.2008 | LU | 27.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | CH | 29.02.2008 | LI | 29.02.2008 | BG | 20.05.2008 | SE | 20.05.2008 | GR | 21.05.2008 | ES | 31.05.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | HU | 21.08.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IT | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
TR | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LU | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IT | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LU | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
HU | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IT | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
LU | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IT | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
IE | 27.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
ES | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
ES | 31.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2288301 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [X]US2002105926 (FAMOLARI DAVID [US], et al); | [X]EP1347614 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [X]US2004028009 (DORENBOSCH JHEROEN P [US], et al) |