EP1464499 - Ink jet head cleaning apparatus and ink jet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Kazuhisa 1-1 Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | 02 /
Akaba, Hideyuki 1-1 Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | 03 /
Ischii, Hidekazu 1-1 Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | 04 /
Nishida, Hideaki 1-1 Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251172.5 | 01.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | US20030395960 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: US 395960 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1464499 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1464499 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
B41J2/16585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/18] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reinigungsvorrichtung für Tintenstrahlkopf und Tintenstrahldruckvorrichtung | [2004/41] | English: | Ink jet head cleaning apparatus and ink jet recording apparatus | [2004/41] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage pour tête à jet d'encre et dispositif d'imprimer a jet d'encre | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002254663 ; | [X]JP2001018418 ; | [X]JPH10151759 ; | [X]JPH10244678 ; | [X]JPH1044445 ; | [X]JPH03290261 ; | [X]EP0427202 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 17, line 28 - page 21, line 20; figures 29,30,35 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030114), vol. 2003, no. 01, & JP2002254663 A 20020911 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001018418 A 20010123 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10151759 A 19980609 (CANON INC) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10244678 A 19980914 (NEC NIIGATA LTD) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10044445 A 19980217 (MINOLTA CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920331), vol. 016, no. 127, Database accession no. (M - 1227), & JP03290261 A 19911219 (CANON INC) [X] 1-14 * abstract * |