EP1457243 - Filtering method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oyachi, Hiroyuki, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. Intellectual Property Department, 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken467-8530 / JP | 02 /
Yonekawa, Hitoshi, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. Intellectual Property Department, 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken467-8530 / JP | 03 /
Aoki, Nobuhiro, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. Intellectual Property Department, 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken467-8530 / JP | 04 /
Murata, Naoki, c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd. Intellectual Property Department, 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken467-8530 / JP | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251350.7 | 09.03.2004 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | JP20030063414 | 10.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003063414 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457243 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457243 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/35, B01D29/66, B01D63/06 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
B05B9/0403 (KR);
B01D61/14 (EP,US);
B01D63/066 (EP,US);
B01D65/02 (EP,US);
B05B9/005 (KR);
B05B9/0805 (KR);
B01D2321/04 (EP,US);
B01D2321/18 (EP,US);
Y10S55/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [2005/22] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Filtration | [2004/38] | English: | Filtering method | [2004/38] | French: | Procédé de filtrage | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 20.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11169681 ; | [A]DE4324347 (NORITAKE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0923983 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US6077436 (RAJNIK LAWRENCE S [US], et al) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [A]GB2368807 (E R E FILTRATION LTD [GB]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11169681 A 19990629 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |