EP1457381 - Commercial vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingimex Ltd. Halesfield 19 Telford Shropshire TF7 4QT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Ingimex Ltd. Halesfield 19 Telford, Shropshire TF7 4QT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallen, Jeremy Martin 42, The Lodge Lincoln Hill Ironbridge Telford Shropshire TF8 7NY / GB | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Moffat, John Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway, Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Moffat, John Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2004/38] | Mosey, Stephen George MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251427.3 | 12.03.2004 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | GB20030005979 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: GB 0305979 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1457381 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1457381 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/28 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
B60P1/283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nutzfahrzeug | [2004/38] | English: | Commercial vehicle | [2004/38] | French: | Véhicule utilitaire | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/14] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2007 | 31.03.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.08.2009 | 31.03.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1469320 (KRAMER ANDREW A) [Y] 2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2140590 (MEININGER CARL W) [X] 1,3-5,8-11,15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6,7,13,14; | [X]US2226213 (WOOD LOUIS S) [X] 26-29,31-34 * the whole document *; | [A]GB546739 (W R INGRAM LTD, et al); | [A]US2490532 (MAXON JR GLENWAY); | [A]GB674125 (BROMILOW & EDWARDS LTD, et al) [A] 16-25 * page 1, line 38 - line 45 * * page 2, line 10 - line 1; figure - *; | [XY]US3135555 (EUGENE MECASKEY) [X] 16 * column 1, line 47 - line 58; figure 1 * [Y] 17-25; | [X]DE1224900 (BENNES PILLOT) [X] 26-29 * the whole document *; | [X]US4066296 (RAY JR LOUIS M, et al) [X] 26,29,30 * column 4, line 55 - line 62 * * abstract *; | [X]US4161338 (BROWN HENRY C [US]) [X] 26-28,32-34 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS55140654 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD); | [X]US4302050 (JONES ELDON D) [X] 26-29,31,32,34 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 26 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0073084 (CARDANAS B V [NL]); | [A]EP0561661 (MARREL SA [FR]); | [A]FR2736014 (MAYSONNAVE JEAN PATRICK [FR]) [A] 29 * page 8, line 30 - line 35; figures 3,6 *; | [Y]DE29800368U (DOLL FAHRZEUGBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 17,18 * figure -; claims 1-11 *; | [Y]US5836657 (TILLEY JEFFREY L [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * abstract *; | [Y]DE29907602U (FFG FLENSBURGER FAHRZEUGBAU GE [DE]) [Y] 19-25 * page 7, line 15 - line 22; figure 5 * | by applicant | US2140590 |