EP1460380 - A method and system of exciting a driving vibration in a vibrator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2008/49] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP | ||
For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokoi Shoji c/o Intellectual Property Dept NGK Insulators Ltd 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi-ken, 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi Yoshihiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2017/34] |
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
Yokoi, Shoji, Intellectual Prop Dept NGK Insulators Ltd, 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi-ken, 467-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
Kobayashi, Yoshihiro, c/o Seiko Epson Co 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Smith, Matthew, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2017/34] |
Former [2004/39] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251600.5 | 19.03.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | JP20030077155 | 20.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003077155 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1460380 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1460380 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G01C19/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/34] |
Former [2005/23] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Anregung einer Schwingung eines Vibrators | [2004/39] | English: | A method and system of exciting a driving vibration in a vibrator | [2004/39] | French: | Procédé et système d'excitation d'une oscillation d'un vibrateur | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.03.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2003021518 ; | [A]DE19811025 (HAHN SCHICKARD GES [DE]) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [X]US2001000853 (YACHI MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 9, paragraph 0134; figure 20 *; | [X]EP1189023 (BEI TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003006784 (WARD PAUL [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030512), vol. 2003, no. 05, & JP2003021518 A 20030124 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [AD] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | JPH07131248 | JP2003032039 |