EP1580361 - Door lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lin, Ching-Tien No. 2, Lane 112, Chu-Yuan Road Hsin-Chung City Taipei Hsien / TW | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251669.0 | 23.03.2004 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1580361 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05B59/00, E05B55/12, E05B65/10 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
E05B59/00 (EP);
E05B55/12 (EP);
E05B63/08 (EP);
E05B65/1086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Türschloss | [2005/39] | English: | Door lock | [2005/39] | French: | Serrure de porte | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/08] | Request for further processing for: | 11.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD108792 (SEIFERT, PETER) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4118455 (TALLERES ESCORIAZA SA [ES]) [A] 1-6* column 4, line 46 - column 6, line 51; figures 1-8 *; | [X]US6651466 (SHIH SIMON [TW]) [X] 1-8,10 * the whole document * |