EP1469684 - Projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karasawa, Joji c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251709.4 | 24.03.2004 | [2004/43] | Priority number, date | JP20030080718 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003080718 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1469684 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1469684 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | [2006/42] |
Former [2006/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP1469684 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2006/27] | |||
[2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
A61C17/34 (KR);
A46B13/02 (KR);
A61C17/349 (KR);
A61C17/40 (KR);
H04N9/3167 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/26] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Projektor | [2004/43] | English: | Projector | [2004/43] | French: | Projecteur | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5442484 (SHIKAMA SHINSUKE [JP]) [X] 6-11 * column 36, line 60 - column 37, line 4 ** column 43, line 14 - column 45, line 3 *; | [X]US5506642 (SUZUKI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 12, line 39 - column 13, line 54 *; | [X]EP1098209 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0065] , [0066] , [0075] - [0077] - [0145] , [0151] , [0152] , [0169] - [0171] * |