EP1462268 - Printer and consumables for use in printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Yozo 1-1 Kanda, Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | 02 /
Uchimura, Mitsuo 1-1 Kanda, Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | 03 /
Koyama, Hiroyuki 1-1 Kanda, Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | 04 /
Miyoshi, Ryohei 1-1 Kanda, Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251755.7 | 25.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030090139 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003090139 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1462268 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1462268 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462268 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/407, B41J11/48, B41J2/32, B41J2/325, B41J11/00 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
B41J3/4075 (EP,US);
B41J11/009 (EP,US);
B41J2/32 (EP,US);
B41J2/325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/19] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drucker und Verbrauchsprodukt zum Einsatz in einem Drucker | [2004/40] | English: | Printer and consumables for use in printer | [2004/40] | French: | Imprimante et consommables pour utilisation dans une imprimante | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001007458 (PURCELL DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 9 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] *; | [X]US2002191998 (CREMON MATS [SE], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 4,5,7 ** paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0039] , [0041] - [0044] - [0060] * |