17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
01.03.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
08.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
01.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
25.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
21.12.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
30.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] |
16.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
23.03.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |
19.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.03.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.10.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.09.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
30.09.2011 |
Change - German title |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
30.09.2011 |
Change - English title |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
30.09.2011 |
Change - French title |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
12.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.06.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.05.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.11.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.06.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.08.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.08.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.04.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.11.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.06.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.10.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
14.09.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
06.06.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |
15.07.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
27.04.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
27.04.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
04.02.2005 |
Change - German title |
published on 23.03.2005 [2005/12] |
19.11.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |