Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008032248 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61223903 | 01.07.2003 | US89448507 | 20.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006073437 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61223903 | 01.07.2003 | US28570705 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7648360 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2010 | B2 | US2005003319 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61223903 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005021668 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US61223903 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1493398 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2012 | B1 | EP1493398 | 05.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61223903 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE554722T | 15.05.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US61223903 | 01.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1575782 | 09.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US61223903 | 01.07.2003 |