EP1493398 - Dental appliance sequence ordering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | Dental appliance sequence ordering system and method | ||
[2011/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 2560 Orchard Parkway San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2010/29] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Align Technology, Inc. 881 Martin Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95050-2903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuo, Eric 912 Beach Park Boulevard, 86 Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/48] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251772.2 | 26.03.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | US20030612239 | 01.07.2003 Original published format: US 612239 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493398 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493398 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/08 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61C7/08 (EP,US);
A61C2202/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | A61C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | System zur Bereitstellung zahnärztlicher Vorrichtungen in einer Sequenz | [2011/44] | English: | Dental appliance sequence ordering system | [2011/44] | French: | Système de commande d'appareils dentaires en séquence | [2011/44] |
Former [2005/01] | System und Verfahren zur Bestellung von Sequenzen zahnärztlicher Vorrichtungen | ||
Former [2005/01] | Dental appliance sequence ordering system and method | ||
Former [2005/01] | Système et procédé de commande de séquences d'appareils dentaires | Examination procedure | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2004 | AT | 25.04.2012 | BE | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | IT | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | PL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
SE | 25.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE7411122U (HELLER, HERBERT, 8000 MÜNCHEN) [X] 1,2,5-7,9 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9208419 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 14; figures 7,12 *; | [X]US5882192 (BERGERSEN EARL O [US]) [X] 1,8,9,11-13,16* column 19, line 34 - line 52; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2003008259 (KUO ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1,8-12,16 * paragraph [0123] * | by applicant | US5975893 |