EP1477959 - Plasma display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 1815-1, Ohaza Tajiri Kunitomi-cho Higashimorokata-gun Miyazaki 880-1194 / JP | [2008/39] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onazawa, Makoto, c/o Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 02 /
Umehara, Kunio, c/o Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Shinsuke, c/o Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 04 /
Ohki, Hideaki, c/o Hitachi Advanced Digital, Inc. 292, Yoshida-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251857.1 | 29.03.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | JP20030138546 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003138546 | [2004/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1477959 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1477959 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
G09G3/294 (EP,US);
A47L17/08 (KR);
G09G3/296 (EP,US);
G09G3/2965 (EP,US);
G09G3/2983 (EP,US);
G09G3/299 (EP,US);
G09G2310/066 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0209 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0228 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0606 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0626 (EP,US);
G09G2330/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/48] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigevorrichtung | [2004/47] | English: | Plasma display device | [2004/47] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à plasma | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/12] | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1041600 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 5 * figures 7,8 *; | [A]US2002089472 (TSAI CHUNG KUANG [TW]) [A] 10* paragraph [0053] *; | [XDY]US2003001801 (SETOGUCHI NORIAKI [JP], et al) [XD] 1-4,6-9,11,14,17-24 * paragraphs [0017] - [0022] - [0028] , [0029] , [0051] , [0052] , [0055]; figures 1-5,12,14,15 * [Y] 5 |