EP1561424 - Non-invasive diagnostic imaging method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimo-Ishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimo-Ishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | |||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimo-Ishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | |||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoisigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanayama, Shoichi 245-1-437 Kawayanagicho 4-chome Koshigaya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Itsumi, Kazuhiro 201 House-Ten-Miyazaki 605-11 Miyazaki Miyamac-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251911.6 | 31.03.2004 | [2005/32] | Priority number, date | JP20040030578 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004030578 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561424 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561424 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/14, A61B5/00 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
A61B8/14 (EP,US);
A47G19/025 (KR);
A47G23/0225 (KR);
A47G23/0306 (KR);
A61B5/0035 (EP,US);
A61B5/0091 (EP,US);
A61B5/0095 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/4312 (EP,US);
A61B8/5238 (EP,US);
G01N29/0609 (EP,US);
A47G2400/08 (KR);
A61B2562/046 (EP,US);
A61B5/145 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02809 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/18] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur nichtinvasiven Diagnostik-Bilderzeugung | [2005/32] | English: | Non-invasive diagnostic imaging method and apparatus | [2005/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'imagerie diagnostique non-invasive | [2005/32] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2004 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 28.05.2008 | [2008/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5999836 (NELSON ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9,29 * column 24, line 1 - line 13 * * column 25, line 8 - line 45 ** figures 14,17,18 *; | [A]US6216540 (NELSON ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9,29 * column 5, line 26 - line 35 * * column 16, line 5 - line 65 * * column 18, line 24 - line 35 * * column 20, line 45 - line 48 * * column 22, line 1 - line 10 * * column 24, line 15 - line 34 * * column 41, line 24 - line 41 *; | [A]US6390978 (IRION KLAUS M [DE], et al) [A] 2-5,7,9,16-19 * column 3, line 56 - line 63 * * column 4, line 47 - line 56 * * column 5, line 18 - line 45 * * column 9, line 17 - column 11, line 38 * * column 12, line 20 - line 41 * * column 13, line 18 * * figures 1,7 *; | [Y]US2003055308 (FRIEMEL BARRY HUGH [US], et al) [Y] 1-23,26-30 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] *; | [XY]US2003167002 (NAGAR RON [IL], et al) [X] 24,25 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] , [0026] , [0027] , [0058] , [0070] , [0073] - [0084] - [0088] , [0147] - [0150] * * figure 1 * [Y] 1-23,26-30 | Examination | US5977538 | WO2005067786 | by applicant | EP0215776 | US5348002 | US5840023 | US6309352 |