EP1464759 - Snow removal machine with system for applying a surface treatment material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cargill, Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata Minnesota 55391 / US | [2009/12] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Cargill Incorporated 15407 McGinty Road West Wayzata, Minnesota 55391 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoerle, Michael 9354 Olympia Drive Eden Prairie, MN 44347 / US | 02 /
Earley, Elizabeth 27346 Edgepark Boulevard North Olmsted, OH 44070 / US | 03 /
Micek, Lawrence L. 2216 Woodbridge Way Woodbury, MN 55125 / US | 04 /
Schmitz, James 1002 Sugarbush Lane Waconia, MN 44387 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/41] | Baldwin, Mark, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co, 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251921.5 | 31.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | US20030404070 | 02.04.2003 Original published format: US 404070 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1464759 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1464759 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464759 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/09, E01H10/00, E01H5/04 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
E01H5/04 (EP,US);
E01H10/007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | E01H5/09, E01H10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichting zum Schneeräumen mit System zum Aufbringen von Material zur Behandlung von Oberflächen | [2004/41] | English: | Snow removal machine with system for applying a surface treatment material | [2004/41] | French: | Dispositif de déneigement avec système d'application d'un matériau pour le traitement de surfaces | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.03.2009 | BE | 18.03.2009 | CY | 18.03.2009 | CZ | 18.03.2009 | DK | 18.03.2009 | EE | 18.03.2009 | FI | 18.03.2009 | IT | 18.03.2009 | NL | 18.03.2009 | PL | 18.03.2009 | RO | 18.03.2009 | SI | 18.03.2009 | SK | 18.03.2009 | TR | 18.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | IE | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | LU | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | FR | 18.05.2009 | BG | 18.06.2009 | GB | 18.06.2009 | SE | 18.06.2009 | GR | 19.06.2009 | ES | 29.06.2009 | PT | 26.08.2009 | HU | 19.09.2009 | DE | 01.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 18.05.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
GB | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
DE | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 18.05.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
GB | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
DE | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IT | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 18.05.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
GB | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
DE | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
FR | 18.05.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
GB | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
DE | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
GB | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
DE | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
DE | 01.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
PT | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
ES | 29.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
BE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 18.03.2009 | |
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 18.03.2009 | |
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 18.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1602041 (HERMANN RAUCH FABRIK) [Y] 19,32 * figure -; claim - *; | [XY]FR2071304 (AMECO SA) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,14-16,18,20,26,28-31,37,38,44 * the whole document * [Y] 7,11-13,17,19,24,25,27,32-35,39-43; | [YA]CH516050 (ULRICH HELMUT DIPL CHEM [DE]) [Y] 7,11-13,17,24,25,27,33-35,42 * the whole document * [A] 1,3,8-10; | [Y]US4390286 (REGALDO PIETRO [IT]) [Y] 40 * column 4, line 47 - line 55 *; | [XY]EP0194565 (MORELLI ALBERTO) [X] 1-5,8-10,20-23,36 * the whole document * [Y] 39,43; | [Y]WO0114497 (UNISEARCH LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 41 * page 1, line 9 - line 17 ** page 2, line 16 - line 29 * | by applicant | US4104812 | US5479730 | US6499237 | US6508018 |