EP1464929 - Electromagnetic flow meter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Limited Stonefield Works Oulton Road, Stone Staffordshire ST15 0RS / GB | [2004/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wray, Troy, ABB Limited Oldends Lane, Stonehouse Gloucestershire, GL10 3TA / GB | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04251978.5 | 01.04.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | GB20030007637 | 02.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0307637 | GB20030015612 | 03.07.2003 Original published format: GB 0315612 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1464929 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1464929 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/58, G01F1/60 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
G01F1/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetischer Durchflussmesser | [2004/41] | English: | Electromagnetic flow meter | [2004/41] | French: | Débimètre électromagnétique | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 25.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/16] | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4773274 (KOBAYASHI TAMOTSU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5; figure 2 * [A] 3-11; | [Y]US5146414 (MCKOWN RUSSEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y]WO0190702 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * |