EP1469667 - Network terminal apparatus that acquires setting information from another network terminal apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2011/48] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kisono, Masahiro 1-17-6-406, Chuou Ebina-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/43] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252244.1 | 16.04.2004 | [2004/43] | Priority number, date | JP20030113789 | 18.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003113789 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1469667 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1469667 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1469667 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32, H04N1/00 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
H04N1/00312 (EP,US);
H04N1/00209 (EP,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/0097 (EP,US);
H04N1/00973 (EP,US);
H04N1/32101 (EP,US);
H04N1/32512 (EP,US);
H04N1/32529 (EP,US);
H04N1/32776 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/24] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Netzendgerät welches Einstellungsinformationen eines anderen Netzendgerätes erfasst | [2004/43] | English: | Network terminal apparatus that acquires setting information from another network terminal apparatus | [2004/43] | French: | Appareil terminal réseau qui acquiert des informations de réglage provenant d'un autre appareil terminal réseau | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | ES | 11.03.2012 | [2013/22] |
Former [2012/37] | IT | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 30.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | JPH11161441 [ ]; | JP2001142814 [ ]; | [A]JPH11161441 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1081637 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001142814 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US6313921 (KADOWAKI TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 10a-10d,12,17,22 * * claims 1-3 * * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 47 * * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 59 *; | [A]EP1191450 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * figure 2 *; | [X]US2002097262 (IWASE AKINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,13-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0120] * * paragraph [0185] - paragraph [0188] * * figure 8 * * claims 1-3,19 * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11161441 A 19990618 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001142814 A 20010525 (FUJITSU LTD) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | JPH11161441 | JP2000196801 | US2002097262 |