EP1484719 - Currency validation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR International, Inc. 3097 Satellite Blvd. Duluth, GA 30096 / US | [2010/13] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ross, Gary Alexander 60 Main Street Colinsburgh, Fife / GB | 02 /
Girolami, Mark Andrew 25 Fereneze Avenue Clarkston Glasgow G76 7RU / GB | 03 /
He, Chao 10 Dunn Street Paisley PA1 1NY / GB | [2017/30] |
Former [2004/50] | 01 /
Ross, Gary Alexander 60 Main Street Colinsburgh, Fife / GB | ||
02 /
Girolami, Mark Andrew 25 Fereneze Avenue, Clarkston Glasgow G76 7RU / GB | |||
03 /
He, Chao 10 Dunn Street Paisley PA1 1NY / GB | Representative(s) | Secerna LLP The Old Fire Station 18 Clifford Street York YO1 9RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Secerna LLP The Catalyst Baird Lane, Heslington East York YO10 5GA / GB | ||
Former [2008/36] | MacLeod, Roderick William, et al NCR Limited Architecture & Technology Discovery Centre 3 Fulton Road Dundee DD2 4SW / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | Williamson, Brian, et al NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252403.3 | 24.04.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | GB20030013002 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: GB 0313002 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484719 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484719 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1484719 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/20 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G06Q20/042 (EP,US);
G06F18/2111 (EP,US);
G06F18/2433 (EP,US);
G06F18/254 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/771 (EP,US);
G06V10/809 (EP,US);
G06V20/95 (EP);
G07D7/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2017/30] |
Former [2006/30] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geldüberprüfung | [2004/50] | English: | Currency validation | [2004/50] | French: | Vérification de monnaie | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.07.2017 | IT | 26.07.2017 | [2018/28] |
Former [2018/14] | ES | 26.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2001043140 (ROSS GARY A [GB]) [X] 1-3,6-9,12-16,18,20-26,29-32,34-37,39-41 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0086] * [Y] 4,5,10,11,17,19,27,28,33,38,42,43; | [YA]EP1246164 (SONY FRANCE SA [FR]) [Y] 33,38 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0058]; figure 1 * [A] 1-43; | [PX] - HE C ET AL, "Employing optimized combinations of one-class classifiers for automated currency validation", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, KIDLINGTON, GB, (20040409), vol. 37, no. 6, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 1085 - 1096, XP004505313 [PX] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.patcog.2004.02.002 | [DYA] - TAX D M J ET AL, "Support vector domain description", PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBL. AMSTERDAM, NL, (199911), vol. 20, no. 11-13, ISSN 0167-8655, pages 1191 - 1199, XP004490753 [DY] 4,5,17,27,28,42,43 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,14-16,25,26,41 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-8655(99)00087-2 | [YA] - B. F. BUXTON, W. B. LANGDON, S. J. BARRET, "Data Fusion by Intelligent Classifier Combination", MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL, vol. 34, no. 8, (200110), pages 229 - 234, URL: http://www.cs.ucl.ac.uk/staff/W.Langdon/mc/, (20050822), XP002341556 [Y] 10,11,19 * the whole document * [A] 1,6-9,14,18,25,29-32,34,37 | [L] - L. M. MANEVITZ, M. YOUSEF, "One-Class SVMs for Document Classification", JOURNAL OF MACHINE LEARNING RESEARCH, Cambridge, MA, USA, (200112), vol. 2, ISSN 1533-7928, pages 139 - 154, XP002341473 [L] 4,5,17,27,28,42,43 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1162/15324430260185574 | [PLX] - CHAO HE, MARK GIROLAMI, GARY ROSS, "Employing optimized combinations of one-class classifiers for automated currency validation", (20030627), pages 1 - 33, URL: http://cis.paisley.ac.uk/research/reports/he---ic0/publication/NCR_PRL2003.pdf, (20050817) [PLX] 1-43 * Cited as support for publication date being between priority and filing of the present application * | Examination | US5729623 | GB2353859 | - KOCH M W ET AL, "Feature discovery in gray level imagery for one-class object recognition", NEURAL NETWORKS, 1994. IEEE WORLD CONGRESS ON COMPUTATIONAL INTELLIGEN CE., 1994 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ORLANDO, FL, USA 27 JUNE-2 JULY 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940627), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ICNN.1994.374707, ISBN 978-0-7803-1901-1, pages 2979 - 2984, XP010127776 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICNN.1994.374707 |