Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
17.10.2008 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
14.10.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
14.10.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
05.06.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
09.05.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.05.2007 | Change - representative | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
22.05.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
10.05.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.03.2007 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
10.11.2006 | First examination report | |
07.11.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.05.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.08.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |
08.07.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
12.11.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |