Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7152411 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2006 | B2 | US2004261419 | 30.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60860903 | 27.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1491823 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2008 | B1 | EP1491823 | 29.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60860903 | 27.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2464563 | 20.10.2009 | C | CA2464563 | 27.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60860903 | 27.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100565014C | 02.12.2009 | C | CN1576699 | 09.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US60860903 | 27.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004017813D1 | 02.01.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US60860903 | 27.06.2003 |