EP1491823 - Rabbet mounted gas turbine combustor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2008/47] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howell, Stephen John 14 Mirra Way West Newbury Massachusetts 01985 / US | 02 /
Jacobson, John Carl 12 sharon Road Melrose Massachusetts 02176 / US | 03 /
McCaffrey, Timothy Patrick 34 Crescent Street Swampscott Massachusetts 01907 / US | 04 /
Barnes, Barry Francis 22 Warren Street Milford Connecticut 06460 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252427.2 | 27.04.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | US20030608609 | 27.06.2003 Original published format: US 608609 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491823 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491823 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00, F23R3/60, F23M5/04 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
F23M5/04 (EP,US);
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F23R3/60 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00017 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gasturbinenbrennkammer auf einem Falz montiert | [2005/01] | English: | Rabbet mounted gas turbine combustor | [2005/01] | French: | Chambre de combustion pour une turbine à gaz montée en raccord d'angle | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2548886 (ALAN HOWARD) [A] 1 * column 9, line 2 - line 25 * * figure 2; claims 1,2,4 *; | [Y]US5524430 (MAZEAUD GEORGES [FR], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 30; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]US5701733 (LEWIS ERIC A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 3 - line 47 * * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 18; figures 1,2 * [Y] 9,10; | [A]US6401447 (RICE EDWARD C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 64; figure 2 *; | [A]US2002108378 (ARIYOSHI KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 9 ** page 2, paragraph 29 - paragraph 35; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2002184891 (CONETE ERIC [FR], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 16 - paragraph 22; figures 1-3 * |