EP1475557 - Oil film sealing device for a rotating shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dresser-Rand Company Paul Clark Drive, P.O. Box 560 Olean, NY 14760 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states DRESSER-RAND COMPANY Paul Clark Drive, P.O. Box 560 Olean, NY 14760 / US | ||
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states Dresser-Rand Company Paul Clark Drive, P.O. Box 560 Olean, NY 14760 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fox, Ronald Elton Jr. 79 Derrick Road Bradford, Pennsylvania 16701 / US | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Every, David Aidan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Every, David Aidan, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252679.8 | 07.05.2004 | [2004/46] | Priority number, date | US20030431987 | 08.05.2003 Original published format: US 431987 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475557 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1475557 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/40 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
F16J15/406 (EP,US);
F04D29/023 (EP,US);
F04D29/122 (EP,US);
F16J15/441 (EP,US);
F05D2230/314 (EP,US);
F05D2300/2261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/30] |
Former [2004/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ölfilm - Wellendichtung | [2004/46] | English: | Oil film sealing device for a rotating shaft | [2004/46] | French: | Film d'huile formant un joint pour un arbre rotatif | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2008/41] | deleted | ||
Former [2007/43] | IT | 19.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3912342 (SCHIRM ALBERT C, et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 23 *; | [A]US4486024 (COOPER GLENN D [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 5, line 36 - column 11, line 21 *; | [A]US4783179 (KATAYAMA KAZUSO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 60, paragraph 5 - page 2 *; | [A]US5186277 (SNUTTJER OWEN R [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 6 - column 10, line 38 *; | [A]US5582414 (MIYAZAKI SATOMICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* column 3, line 11 - column 9, line 3 *; | [A]US6070881 (LONGREE ALEXANDER [DE]) [A] 1-17 * column 6, line 19 - column 9, line 16 * |