EP1479633 - Sheet copy documents producing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2008/22] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markovitz, James 55 Brougham Drive Penfield, NY 14526 / US | 02 /
Milillo, Richard J. 16 Delemere Boulevard Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 03 /
Dunham, Brian J. 623 Webster Road Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252764.8 | 13.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | US20030440751 | 19.05.2003 Original published format: US 440751 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479633 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1479633 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | [2006/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1479633 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65H43/00, B65H31/00, B65H31/24 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
B65H43/00 (EP,US);
B65H31/24 (EP,US);
B65H2407/10 (EP,US);
B65H2408/118 (EP,US);
B65H2801/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/48] | B65H43/00, B65H31/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/39] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Maschine zur Erzeugung von Dokumentkopierblättern | [2004/48] | English: | Sheet copy documents producing machine | [2004/48] | French: | Machine pour la production de feuilles de copie de document | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 14.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1116239 (BOBST & SOHN A G J) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3106393 (WERNER KOCH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5172904 (SZE CHO [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 9; figure - *; | [A]DE19925068 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [A] 1* claim 2 *; | [A] - BLANCHARD K F ET AL, "MODULAR INPUT/OUTPUT DEVICE ARCHITECTURE", XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL, XEROX CORPORATION. STAMFORD, CONN, US, (19940501), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 247 - 248, XP000449328 [A] 1 |