EP1515093 - Overheated steam oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shozo, Kobayashi No.531-1305, Shin An Apt, 363-2 Youngtong-Dong Paldal-Gu, Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Waddington, Richard, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Waddington, Richard, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04252895.0 | 19.05.2004 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | KR20030063009 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: KR 2003063009 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1515093 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/32, A47J27/16, A47J27/04, A21B3/04 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
A21B3/04 (EP,US);
A47J27/16 (KR);
F24C15/327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dampfofen | [2005/11] | English: | Overheated steam oven | [2005/11] | French: | Four à vapeur | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |