EP1494428 - Method and apparatus for implementing secure VPN access via modified certificate strings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Inc. 6021 Connection Drive, MS 2-5-520 Irving, TX 75039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Nokia Inc. 6021 Connection Drive MS 2-5-520 Irving, TX 75039 / US | ||
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states Nokia Inc. 6000 Connection Drive Irving, TX 75039 / US | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karjala, Jari Aapramintie 1 C 27 01610 Vantaa / FI | 02 /
Palojarvi, Jari Harmalansaarenkatu 3A 3 33900 Tampere / FI | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner, Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253083.2 | 26.05.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | US20030608818 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: US 608818 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494428 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494428 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04Q7/38 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06F15/16 (KR);
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
H04L63/062 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung eines sicheren VPN-Zugriffs mittels veränderter Zertifikat-Zeichenketten | [2005/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for implementing secure VPN access via modified certificate strings | [2005/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour implémenter un accès à un réseau privé virtuel (VPN) sécurisé au moyen de chaînes de caractères de certificats modifiées | [2006/25] |
Former [2005/01] | Procédé et dispositif permettant un accès à un réseau privé virtuel (VPN) sécurisé au moyen des chaînes de caractères de certificats modifiés | Examination procedure | 03.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.01.2007 | BE | 17.01.2007 | CH | 17.01.2007 | CY | 17.01.2007 | CZ | 17.01.2007 | DK | 17.01.2007 | EE | 17.01.2007 | FI | 17.01.2007 | LI | 17.01.2007 | NL | 17.01.2007 | PL | 17.01.2007 | RO | 17.01.2007 | SI | 17.01.2007 | SK | 17.01.2007 | TR | 17.01.2007 | SE | 17.04.2007 | BG | 18.04.2007 | GR | 18.04.2007 | LU | 26.05.2007 | IE | 28.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | PT | 18.06.2007 | HU | 18.07.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CY | 17.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
EE | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
LU | 26.05.2007 | ||
IE | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CY | 17.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
EE | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
EE | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 28.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
GR | 18.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
RO | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
BE | 17.01.2007 | ||
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SK | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 17.01.2007 | |
CH | 17.01.2007 | ||
DK | 17.01.2007 | ||
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SI | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CH | 17.01.2007 | |
FI | 17.01.2007 | ||
LI | 17.01.2007 | ||
NL | 17.01.2007 | ||
PL | 17.01.2007 | ||
SE | 17.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6141751 (OGAWA HIDEHARU [JP]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 6-17 * * column 2, lines 5-32 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 67 * * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 18 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6148406 (WEISZ HERMAN [BE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 67 ** figures 1-8 *; | [X]WO02073377 (JALOVECZKI LASZLO [HU]) [X] 1-14 * page 8, line 16 - page 12, line 16 * * page 15, line 22 - page 17, line 2 * * figures 1-3 * |