EP1482126 - Rotor assembly for a gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/49] | Dovetail assembly of a gas turbine engine | ||
[2010/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dibella, Joseph John 23 Courtney Road West Roxbury, MA 02132-1043 / US | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/33] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Pedder, James Cuthbert, et al London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253139.2 | 27.05.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | US20030447817 | 29.05.2003 Original published format: US 447817 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1482126 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1482126 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482126 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
F01D5/3038 (EP,US);
F05D2250/70 (EP,US);
F05D2250/711 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/30] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rotoranordnung für eine Gasturbinentriebwerk | [2010/42] | English: | Rotor assembly for a gas turbine engine | [2010/42] | French: | Ensemble rotor pour moteur à turbine à gaz | [2010/42] |
Former [2004/49] | Schwalbenschwanzförmige Schaufelanordnung in einer Gasturbine | ||
Former [2004/49] | Dovetail assembly of a gas turbine engine | ||
Former [2004/49] | Aubage en forme de queue d'aronde dans une turbine à gaz | Examination procedure | 22.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 11.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1294695 (RICHARDSONS) [X] 1-6 * page 1, column 2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5183389 (GILCHRIST ALAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6375429 (HALILA HERBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-6* column 4, lines 17-65; figure 4 * |