EP1481696 - Implantable articles with strontium-substituted apatite coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw Indiana 46581 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Depuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, Indiana 46581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Panjian 11108 Bitter Dell FT Wayne, IN 46814 / US | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253205.1 | 28.05.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | US20030448685 | 30.05.2003 Original published format: US 448685 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1481696 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1481696 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/32, A61L31/08 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
A61L31/086 (EP,US);
A61L27/32 (EP,US);
Y10T428/131 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1376 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Title | German: | Implantierbare Artikel mit Beschichtung aus strontiumsubstituiertem Apatit | [2004/49] | English: | Implantable articles with strontium-substituted apatite coating | [2004/49] | French: | Articles implantables ayant un revêtement d'apatite substitué en strontium | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 17.07.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5441536 (AOKI HIDEKI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,22 * column 4, line 12 - line 22 * * example - * * claim - *; | [A]US6139585 (LI PANJIAN [US]) [A] 1,22 * the whole document *; | [A]US6143948 (LEITAO EUGENIA RIBEIRO DE SOUS [GB], et al) [A] 1,22 * example - ** claim - *; | [A]US6280789 (REY CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1,22 * claim - *; | [A] - LI Y W ET AL, "Novel injectable bioactive bone cement for spinal surgery: a developmental and preclinical study", J BIOMED MATER RES; JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH OCT 2000 JOHN WILEY & SONS INC, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (200010), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 164 - 170, XP002301270 [A] 1,22 * page 165 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-4636(200010)52:1<164::AID-JBM21>3.0.CO;2-R |