EP1488774 - Polymer compositions and processes for preparing polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | ||
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Creamer, Marianne Patricia 1827 Buttonwood Way Warrington Pennsylvania 18976 / US | 02 /
Greene, Lester William Jr. 1655 Park Avenue Willow Grove Pennsylvania 19090 / US | 03 /
Kar, Ari Kenneth 178 Buttercup Blvd. Warrington Pennsylvania 18976 / US | 04 /
Wang, Miao 4740 Macgregor Drive Schwenksville PA 19473 / US | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2004/52] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Patent Department 28th. Floor, City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253308.3 | 03.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | US20030479079P | 17.06.2003 Original published format: US 479079 P | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1488774 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1488774 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488774 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/56 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K8/898 (KR);
A61K8/8158 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/89 (KR);
A61Q5/00 (KR);
A61Q5/12 (EP,BR,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/41] | A61K7/00, C08F220/56 | ||
Former IPC [2004/52] | A61K7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/25] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Polymerzusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Polymerherstellung | [2004/52] | English: | Polymer compositions and processes for preparing polymers | [2004/52] | French: | Composition polymère et procédé de fabrication de polymères | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4407321 (WILSKI HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * examples 19,14; claim 1 *; | [A]US4578267 (SALAMONE ANN B [US]) [A] 1-10* examples 1,3 *; | [DA]US6569413 (HESSEFORT YIN Z [US], et al) [DA] 1-10 * example 3; claim 1 * |