EP1489813 - Cellular telephone protocol adaptive printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2009/38] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCoog, Phillip A. 2000 NE Ridgewood Drive Portland, OR 97212 / US | 02 /
Blume, Leo Robert P.O. Box 50160 Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 03 /
Pathak, Rabindra 18619 SE 24th Street Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | 04 /
Strittmatter, Michael 1700 Gough Street, 404 San Francisco, CA 94109 / US | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Durville, Guillaume, et al Hewlett-Packard Española, S.L. Legal Department Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 Sant Cugat del Valles 08174 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Durville, Guillaume, et al Hewlett Packard Española, S.L. Legal Department Avda. Graells ,501 Sant Cugat del Vallès 08174 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2004/52] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04253472.7 | 10.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | US20030463383 | 16.06.2003 Original published format: US 463383 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1489813 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1489813 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Title | German: | Adaptives Drucken zum Protokoll eines zellularen Telefons | [2004/52] | English: | Cellular telephone protocol adaptive printing | [2004/52] | French: | Protocole d'impression adaptable pour un téléphone cellulaire | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 24.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.2009 | BE | 16.09.2009 | BG | 16.09.2009 | CY | 16.09.2009 | CZ | 16.09.2009 | DK | 16.09.2009 | EE | 16.09.2009 | FI | 16.09.2009 | IT | 16.09.2009 | PL | 16.09.2009 | RO | 16.09.2009 | SE | 16.09.2009 | SI | 16.09.2009 | SK | 16.09.2009 | TR | 16.09.2009 | GR | 17.12.2009 | ES | 27.12.2009 | PT | 18.01.2010 | HU | 17.03.2010 | IE | 10.06.2010 | LU | 10.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.06.2010 | ||
LU | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
IE | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
IE | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BE | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 16.09.2009 | |
SE | 16.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9935818 (MONROE DAVID [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 24 - page 5, line 12 * * page 9, line 25 - line 29 * * page 11, line 4 - line 9 * * page 13, line 20 - line 21 * * page 15, line 4 * * page 15, line 16 - line 17 * * page 18, line 15 - line 18 * * claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP1271889 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003005050 (PINEAU RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003015846 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US6553240 (DERVARICS GERGELY [HU]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |