EP1496314 - Humidification system with reverse osmosis filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON-WILLIAMS GROUP LIMITED Station Road Edenbridge Kent TN8 6EG / GB | [2006/28] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states EATON-WILLIAMS GROUP LIMITED Station Road Edenbridge, Kent TN8 6EG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watts, Robert John 12 Coopers Wood Crowborough, TN6 1SW East Sussex / GB | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson, Kingsbourne House, 229-231 High Holborn London WC1V 7DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254043.5 | 06.07.2004 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | GB20030015873 | 07.07.2003 Original published format: GB 0315873 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496314 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496314 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24F6/02, F24F11/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
F24F11/0008 (EP,US);
B01D61/08 (EP,US);
B01D61/12 (EP,US);
F24F6/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
F24F2006/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Title | German: | Belüftungssystem mit einem Umkehrosmose-Filtereinsatz | [2005/02] | English: | Humidification system with reverse osmosis filter | [2005/02] | French: | Systeme de humidification a filtre a osmose inverse | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 10.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.07.2006 | CZ | 12.07.2006 | EE | 12.07.2006 | FI | 12.07.2006 | PL | 12.07.2006 | RO | 12.07.2006 | SI | 12.07.2006 | SK | 12.07.2006 | TR | 12.07.2006 | BG | 12.10.2006 | SE | 12.10.2006 | GR | 13.10.2006 | PT | 12.12.2006 | HU | 13.01.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 12.07.2006 | |
CZ | 12.07.2006 | ||
EE | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
EE | 12.07.2006 | ||
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
GR | 13.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/43] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
IT | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
RO | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
SK | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 12.07.2006 | |
FI | 12.07.2006 | ||
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 12.07.2006 | |
PL | 12.07.2006 | ||
SI | 12.07.2006 | ||
BG | 12.10.2006 | ||
SE | 12.10.2006 | ||
PT | 12.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 12.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09299944 ; | [A]WO0010695 (RAYTEC CORP [US]); | [A]US6092794 (REENS DANIEL J [US]); | [A]US6375849 (CRABTREE RON [US], et al); | [A]EP1240938 (MICHELBACH LUDWIG [DE]) |