Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005061719 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0315873 | 07.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1496314 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2006 | B1 | EP1496314 | 12.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0315873 | 07.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE333073T | 15.08.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0315873 | 07.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004001491T | 08.02.2007 | T2 | DE602004001491D1 | 24.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0315873 | 07.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1496314T | 06.11.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0315873 | 07.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2268583T | 16.03.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0315873 | 07.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0315873D0 | 13.08.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0315873 | 07.07.2003 |