EP1496561 - A laminate useful as a membrane-electrode assembly for fuel cells, production process therefor and a fuel cell provided with the laminate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukuta, Kenji Tokuyama Corp. 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | 02 /
Sadasue, Kazuyuki Tokuyama Corp. 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | 03 /
Isomura, Takenori Tokuyama Corp. 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | 04 /
Sakata, Kanji Tokuyama Corp. 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/02] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254135.9 | 09.07.2004 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | JP20030195499 | 11.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003195499 | JP20030204483 | 31.07.2003 Original published format: JP 2003204483 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1496561 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1496561 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/10 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M4/86 (KR);
H01M4/925 (EP,US);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
H01M8/1051 (EP,US);
H01M8/1053 (EP,US);
H01M8/1072 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Title | German: | Ein Laminat zur Verwendung als Membranelektrodenanordnung für Brennstoffzellen, dessen Herstellungsverfahren und eine das Laminat enthaltende Brennstoffzelle | [2005/02] | English: | A laminate useful as a membrane-electrode assembly for fuel cells, production process therefor and a fuel cell provided with the laminate | [2005/02] | French: | Un laminé utilisé comme assemblage membrane-électrode pour piles à combustible, son procédé de fabrication et pile à combustible comprenant un tel laminé | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/25] | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6444343 (PRAKASH G K SURYA [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 1 - line 13 * * column 2, line 12 - line 48 * * column 3, line 16 - line 27 * * column 6, line 38 - line 52 * * column 8, line 48 - line 60 *; | [XA]US6523699 (AKITA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-7 [A] 2,3; | [A]WO03026051 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO03033566 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 [A] 3; | [A]JP2003157862 (TOKUYAMA CORP) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [PAL]US2004053113 (NISHIKAWA OSAMU [JP], et al) [PAL] 1-7 * figures 2,4 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0028] , [0029] , [0032] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraphs [0120] , [0170] ** paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0189] *; | [L]EP1457511 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [L] * paragraphs [0200] , [0205] * * paragraph [0228] - paragraph [0231] * * paragraph [0241] * * paragraph [0254] - paragraph [0261] * * paragraph [0306] * | by applicant | US6523699 | WO03026051 | WO03033566 | JP2003157862 |