EP1498736 - Method for mixing a liquid in an analyzer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORTHO-CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS, INC. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester, New York 14626 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Ortho-Clinical Diagnostics, Inc. 100 Indigo Creek Drive Rochester, New York 14626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobs, Merrit 3 Foxboro Terrace Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 02 /
Graham, Ed 1560 Nine Mile Point Road Penfield, NY 14526 / US | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/03] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254308.2 | 16.07.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | US20030622258 | 18.07.2003 Original published format: US 622258 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1498736 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/10 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/92 (EP,US);
G01N35/10 (EP,KR,US);
B01F31/65 (EP,US);
B01F31/651 (EP,US);
G01N35/00 (KR);
G01N2035/106 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Mischen einer Flüssigkeit in einem Analysegerät | [2005/03] | English: | Method for mixing a liquid in an analyzer | [2005/03] | French: | Procédé pour mélanger un liquide dans une analysateur | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 19.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/47] | Request for further processing for: | 13.09.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3115568 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0411620 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,4,15,17 * page 5, line 54 - page 6, line 8 * * page 7, line 41 - line 50 *; | [A]WO9325309 (KAARTINEN NIILO [FI]) [A] 1-18 * page 12, line 16 - page 13, line 27 * * page 16, line 23 - page 17, line 14 * * figures 7-9,15-18 *; | [A]US5443791 (CATHCART G RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0670483 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A]EP1116953 (ORTHO CLINICAL DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0039] , [0042] *; | [XY]EP1138372 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-14,16,18 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 11 - line 44 * * claim 5 * * figures 1A-1F * [Y] 3,4,15,17; | [A]EP1154274 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A] - F. DAVIS, J. PALANDER, J. BUSSELL, "Automated laboratory analyzers analyzed", IVD TECHNOLOGY, (200208), URL: www.devicelink.com, (20041021), XP002301930 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | Examination | DE19900347 |