EP1505742 - Apparatus and method using a beam pattern for transmitting a common and a dedicated signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higuchi, Kenichi, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Sawahashi, Mamoru NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Ihara, Taisuke, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2012/13] |
Former [2005/06] | 01 /
Higuchi, Kenichi, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Sawahashi, Mamoru NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Ihara, Taisuke, NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/06] | Maury, Richard Philip MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254603.6 | 30.07.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | JP20030206811 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003206811 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1505742 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1505742 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505742 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/00, H04B7/06, H01Q3/26 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
H04B7/0408 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q25/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q3/26 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q3/2605 (EP,KR,US);
H01Q3/30 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/20] | H04Q7/36, H04B7/06, H01Q3/26 | ||
Former IPC [2005/06] | H04B7/06, H01Q3/26 | Designated contracting states | DE [2012/13] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren unter Verwendung eines Richtdiagramms zur Übertragung eines gemeinsamen und eines zugeordneten Signals | [2005/06] | English: | Apparatus and method using a beam pattern for transmitting a common and a dedicated signal | [2005/06] | French: | Appareil et procédé utilisant un diagramme de faisceau pour transmettre un signal commun et un signal dédié | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6330459 (CRICHTON PAUL [GB], et al) [Y] 1,11 * column 2, line 25 - line 30 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 27 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 16 * * column 6, line 25 - line 31 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1267501 (MOBISPHERE LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,11 * abstract ** paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] *; | [PX]WO2004054153 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]) [PX] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0044] *; | [DX] - IHARA T ET AL, "Efficient common channel transmission employing multi-beam antenns in w-cdma forward link", COMMUNICATION SYSTTEMS, 2002. ICCS 2002. THE 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NOV. 25-28, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20021125), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7510-6, pages 451 - 455, XP010629259 [DX] 1-15 * the whole document * |