EP1506932 - Booklet maker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2006/39] |
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruthenberg, Raymond M 82 Eagle Road Toronto Ontario M8Z 4J2 / CA | 02 /
McNamara, Joseph M 1508 Lockhart Road Mississauga Ontario L5J 3X3 / CA | 03 /
Van Wyngaarden, David C 37 Orchard Park Blvd. Toronto Ontario M4L 3E3 / CA | 04 /
Siu, Steven K 4575 Donegal Drive Mississauga Ontario L5M 4H3 / CA | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2005/07] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254633.3 | 02.08.2004 | [2005/07] | Priority number, date | US20030642410 | 15.08.2003 Original published format: US 642410 | [2005/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506932 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1506932 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/18 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
B65H45/18 (EP,US);
B65H2403/40 (EP,US);
B65H2403/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/44] |
Former [2005/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Broschüren | [2005/07] | English: | Booklet maker | [2005/07] | French: | Dispositif de fabrication de brochures | [2005/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]JP2004106976 ; | [A]US3671033 (COAST JOHN B) [A] 1 * column 4, line 25 - line 41; figure 3 *; | [A]US5738620 (EBNER ARNO [DE], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US6276677 (HOMMOCHI HIROKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10122113 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figures 6,7 * | [PA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004106976 A 20040408 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [PA] 1-6 * abstract * |