EP1505539 - Image processing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nose, Atsushi c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Aoyama, Koji c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kurata, Tohru c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Wada, Kimitaka c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254667.1 | 04.08.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | JP20030288109 | 06.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003288109 | JP20030292725 | 13.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003292725 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1505539 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1505539 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40, G06T3/00 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
G06T3/047 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/69 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/06] | G06T3/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/04] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bildverarbeitung | [2005/06] | English: | Image processing method and apparatus | [2005/06] | French: | Méthode et appareil de traitement d'image | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 19.11.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5276519 (RICHARDS JOHN W [GB], et al); | [Y]EP0720125 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE LAB [FR], et al); | [A]US5818527 (YAMAGUCHI TATSUYA [JP], et al); | [A]EP1274224 (NOKIA CORP [FI]); | [A]US2003133019 (HIGURASHI MASAKI [JP], et al); | by applicant | US5276519 | JP2925871B |