EP1505257 - Gas turbine blade circuit cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cunha, Frank J. 5 Bruce Lane Avon, CT 06001 / US | 02 /
Santeler, Keith A. 84 Clarence Court Middletown, CT 06457 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/06] | Leckey, David H. Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EV4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254757.0 | 06.08.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | US20030637352 | 08.08.2003 Original published format: US 637352 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1505257 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1505257 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505257 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F01D5/18 (KR);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2260/22141 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/12] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlkreislauf für Gasturbinenschaufeln | [2014/45] | English: | Gas turbine blade circuit cooling | [2005/06] | French: | Circuit de refroidissement pour aubes de turbines à gaz | [2005/06] |
Former [2005/06] | Kühlkreislauf für Gastubinenschaufeln | Examination procedure | 04.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 10.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0814001 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1,17-19 *; | [A]US5649806 (SCRICCA JOSEPH A [US], et al) [A] 22 * abstract ** figure 3 *; | [A]WO9825009 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - page 7, line 30 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5772397 (MORRIS MARK C [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, lines 6-45 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO0100964 (ALLISON ADVANCED DEV CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * pages 3,4 * * page 8, line 13 - page 11, line 13 * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]EP1091091 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-9,16-28 * abstract * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 12 * * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 39 * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | WO0100964 | EP1091091 |