EP1626475 - Integrated charger with multi-form input sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Tai-Her No 59 Chung Hsing 8 Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states Tai-Her, Yang No 59 Chung Hsing 8 Street Si-Hu Town Dzan-Hwa / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254847.9 | 12.08.2004 | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626475 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/14, H02K7/18, H02J7/34 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
H02J7/1423 (EP,US);
H02J7/1415 (EP,US);
H02J7/32 (EP,US);
H02J7/34 (EP,US);
H02J2207/40 (EP,US);
H02J7/0042 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Title | German: | Integriertes Batterieladegerät mit unterschiedlichen Stromquellen | [2006/07] | English: | Integrated charger with multi-form input sources | [2006/07] | French: | Chargeur intégré avec des sources d'energie diverses | [2006/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 04.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/29] | 05.03.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11288742 ; | [X]JP2000253621 ; | [XA]JPH10210673 ; | [A]JPH1175344 ; | [Y]US4794315 (PEDERSON JOHN T [US], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [XA]JPH10210673 (TDK CORP) [X] 7 * abstract * [A] 1-6; | [A]JPH1175344 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [YA]JPH11288742 (NIPPON CHEMICON) [Y] 1-4,6 * abstract * [A] 5,7; | [X]JP2000253621 (SONY CORP) [X] 7 * paragraph [0041]; figures 1,8,10 *; | [YX]US2002067143 (ROBINETT MARK I [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 1 - page 6; figures 1,4,6,7,12,15 * [X] 7 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11288742 A 19991019 (NIPPON CHEMICON CORP) [Y] 1-4,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000253621 A 20000914 (SONY CORP) [X] 7 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10210673 A 19980807 (TDK CORP) [X] 7 * abstract * [A] 1-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11075344 A 19990316 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | Examination | US2003184165 |