EP1510785 - Navigation information providing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | For all designated states Increment P Corporation 1-14, Nisshincho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 212-0024 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | ||
For all designated states Increment P Corporation 7-1, Shimomeguro 1-chome, Meguro-Ku Tokyo 153-8665 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Koji, c/o Increment P Corporation 7-1 Shimomeguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8665 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Nobuaki, c/o Increment P Corporation 7-1 Shimomeguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8665 / JP | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254890.9 | 13.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | JP20030209789 | 29.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003209789 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510785 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
G01C21/34 (EP,US);
G06Q10/025 (EP,US);
G07F17/0014 (EP,US);
G07F17/16 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/47] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von Navigationsinformationen | [2005/09] | English: | Navigation information providing apparatus | [2005/09] | French: | Dispositif fournissant des informations de navigation | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 28.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/21] | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0645603 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 22 * * figure 5 *; | [X]EP1152383 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18 * column 3, line 38 - column 7, line 51 * * column 11, line 47 - column 12, line 16 * * column 16, line 35 - column 22, line 24 *; | [A]US6317686 (RAN BIN [US]) [A] 1,7* column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 63 * | Examination | EP0816802 | US2001029425 |