EP1508906 - Capacitor, method of manufacturing the same and memory device including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jung-hyun, c/o 106-803 Taeyoung Leisvill Apt. Poongdeokcheon 2-dong Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Seo, Bum-seok 1207 Sinwon Plaza, Gocheok 1-dong, Guro-gu Seoul / KR | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04254930.3 | 17.08.2004 | [2005/08] | Priority number, date | KR20030056857 | 18.08.2003 Original published format: KR 2003056857 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1508906 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1508906 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/10, H01L21/02, H01G4/12 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
H01L28/40 (EP,US);
H10B12/00 (KR);
H01G4/10 (EP,US);
H01G4/1272 (EP,US);
H10B51/00 (EP,US);
H10B51/30 (EP,US);
H10B53/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/022 (EP);
H01L21/02263 (EP);
H01L21/02271 (EP);
H01L21/0228 (EP);
H01L21/31604 (US);
H01L28/56 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/08] | H01G4/10, H01L21/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/33] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kondensator, dessen Herstellungsverfahren und Speichermodul dass diesen Kondensator umfasst | [2005/08] | English: | Capacitor, method of manufacturing the same and memory device including the same | [2005/08] | French: | Condensateur, son procédé de fabrication et module de mémoire comprenant cette condensateur | [2005/08] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 30.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0800187 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [Y]US5841186 (SUN SHI-CHUNG [TW], et al); | [Y]US6281066 (SONG HAN SANG [KR], et al); | [XY]WO0231875 (ASM INC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO0231875 |