EP1513191 - Heating apparatus having electrostatic adsorption function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Company, Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2012/28] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Company, Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kushihashi, Takuma, c/o Gunma Complex Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Kurosawa, Yukio, c/o Gunma Complex Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Seki, Masaki, c/o Gunma Complex Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [2012/28] |
Former [2005/10] | 01 /
Kushihashi, Takuma, c/o Gunma Complex Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kurosawa, Yukio, c/o Gunma Complex Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Seki, Masaki, c/o Gunma Complex Shin-Etsu Chemical Co. Ltd. 2-13-1, Isobe Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2005/10] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company, Scotland House, 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255100.2 | 25.08.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | JP20030209136 | 27.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003209136 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1513191 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1513191 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513191 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/687, H01L21/683 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H01L21/68757 (EP,US);
H01L21/67103 (EP,US);
H01L21/6833 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/10] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/48] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Heizvorrichtung mit elektrostatischer Adsorptionsfunktion | [2005/10] | English: | Heating apparatus having electrostatic adsorption function | [2005/10] | French: | Dispositif de chauffage comprenant une fonction d'adsorption électrostatique | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09213774 ; | [A]US5530616 (KITABAYASHI TETSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US5591269 (ARAMI JUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]US5665260 (KAWADA NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO9959201 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US2002044404 (KOSAKAI MAMORU [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1220311 (ADVANCED CERAMICS INTERNAT COR [US]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] *; | [Y]US6491571 (OHNO MASASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - column 5, line 35 *; | [A]US2003107865 (MASUDA SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09213774 A 19970815 (KYOCERA CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |