EP1510171 - Analytical device with prediction module and related methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeScan, Inc. 1000 Gibraltar Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states LIFESCAN, INC. 1000 Gibraltar Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stout, Phil 2927 Galtier Street Roseville, MN 55113 / US | 02 /
Melander, Todd 3208 Dupont Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/09] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255207.5 | 27.08.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | US20030652464 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: US 652464 | US20030653023 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: US 653023 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510171 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/15 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61B5/14 (KR);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0431 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0295 (EP,US);
A61B5/022 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B5/1486 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/6824 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Analytische Einrichtung mit Vorhersagemodul und zugehöriges Verfahren | [2005/09] | English: | Analytical device with prediction module and related methods | [2005/09] | French: | Appareil analytique avec un module de prédiction et méthodes associées | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/33] | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6332871 (DOUGLAS JOEL S [US], et al) [A] 1,12* column 3, line 30 - column 8, line 40 *; | [YA]EP1260815 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [Y] 1,3,10-12,16 * column 9, lines 46-55 * * column 7, lines 8-15 * * column 3, paragraph 13 - column 5, paragraph 19 * [A] 2,4-9,13-15; | [A]US2003055326 (SOHRAB BORZU [US]) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0027] *; | [Y] - SCHMIDTKE ET AL., "Measurement and modeling of the transient difference between blood and subcutaneous glucose concentrations in the rat after injection of insulin", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (199801), vol. 95, pages 294 - 299, XP001203807 [Y] 1,3,10-12,16 * page 296, column 1 - page 298, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.1.294 |