EP1633102 - Split channel authenticity queries in multi-party dialog [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yach, David, P. 254 Castlefield Avenue, Waterloo Ontario, N2K 2N1 / CA | 02 /
Little, Herbert, A. 504 Old Oak Place, Waterloo Ontario, N2T 2V8 / CA | 03 /
Klassen, Gerhard, D. 510 Heatherhill Place, Waterloo Ontario, N2T 1H7 / CA | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255278.6 | 01.09.2004 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633102 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633102 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L63/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/10] | Extension states | AL | 07.09.2006 | HR | 07.09.2006 | LT | 07.09.2006 | LV | 07.09.2006 | MK | 07.09.2006 | Title | German: | Verteilkanalauthentifikationsabfragen im Mehrparteiendialog | [2006/10] | English: | Split channel authenticity queries in multi-party dialog | [2006/10] | French: | Interrogation d'authentification par division de canaux dans un dialogue entre plusieurs parties | [2006/10] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 07.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2006 | BE | 02.11.2006 | CH | 02.11.2006 | CY | 02.11.2006 | CZ | 02.11.2006 | EE | 02.11.2006 | FI | 02.11.2006 | IT | 02.11.2006 | LI | 02.11.2006 | NL | 02.11.2006 | PL | 02.11.2006 | RO | 02.11.2006 | SI | 02.11.2006 | SK | 02.11.2006 | TR | 02.11.2006 | BG | 02.02.2007 | DK | 02.02.2007 | SE | 02.02.2007 | GR | 03.02.2007 | ES | 13.02.2007 | PT | 02.04.2007 | HU | 03.05.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CY | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
EE | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
PL | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
SI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
EE | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
PL | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
SI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
PL | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
SI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
PL | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
SI | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
PL | 02.11.2006 | ||
RO | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
PL | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
PL | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 02.11.2006 | |
ES | 13.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5668876 (FALK JOHAN PER [SE], et al) [A] 1-22* column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 37 *; | [A]US5774525 (KANEVSKY DIMITRI [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 2, lines 5-38 * * column 3, line 59 - column 5, line 65 *; | [A]US2002004831 (WOODHILL JAMES R [US]) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0030] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0089] *; | [A]EP1422960 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0035] * |