blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1516704

EP1516704 - Device for determining interference region of robot [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2007
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.12.2007  [2007/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun
Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/12]For all designated states
FANUC LTD
3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okuda, Mitsuhiro, FANUC Manshonharimomi
Room 10-208 3511-1, Shibokusa Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0511 / JP
02 / Fuchigami, Hirokazu FANUC Manshonharimomi
Room 6-202, 3511-1 Shibokusa Oshino-mura
Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi, 401-0511 / JP
 [2005/12]
Representative(s)Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/12]Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al
Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date04255296.801.09.2004
[2005/12]
Priority number, dateJP2003031270604.09.2003         Original published format: JP 2003312706
[2005/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1516704
Date:23.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
ClassificationIPC:B25J9/16, G05B19/4061
[2005/12]
CPC:
B25J9/1666 (EP,US); G05B19/4061 (EP,US); Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung dem Interferenzbereich eines Roboters[2005/12]
English:Device for determining interference region of robot[2005/12]
French:Dispositif de détermination de la zone d'interférence d'un robot[2005/12]
Examination procedure02.08.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200704   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.