EP1513356 - Radio communication system and terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/10] | Radio communication system and radio communication device | ||
[2012/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications Japan, Inc. 1-8-15 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications Japan, Inc. 1-8-15, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications Japan, Inc. 1-8-15, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Katsutoshi, c/o Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications Japan, Inc. 1-8-15, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/31] |
Former [2005/10] | 01 /
Itoh, Katsutoshi, c/o Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications Japan, Inc. 1-8-15, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/10] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04255309.9 | 02.09.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | JP20030309660 | 02.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003309660 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1513356 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1513356 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513356 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L1/00, H04W28/22, H04W72/04 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
H04L1/1874 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0075 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0219 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/23] | H04Q7/22, H04L1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2005/10] | H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2008/07] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Vorrichtung zur Funkkommunikation | [2005/10] | English: | Radio communication system and terminal | [2012/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de radiocommunication | [2005/10] |
Former [2005/10] | Radio communication system and radio communication device | Examination procedure | 15.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 01.08.2012 | SE | 01.08.2012 | [2013/12] |
Former [2013/09] | FI | 01.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0191322 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [XY]WO02084930 (MARCONI COMM GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]EP1259015 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US2002176482 (CHIEN CHARLES [US]); | [A]WO03026189 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US], et al); | [PX]EP1437912 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | WO9803030 | WO0147146 | WO0191322 | WO02084930 | EP1437912 |